Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jourdain Cattani

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1447AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
Jun 1447³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Capua, Italy
19 Jan 1485AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
13 Oct 1496DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jourdain Cattani
Patriarch Jourdain Cattani (died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCapua, Archdiocese of Capua

  • a bishop for 49.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 118, and Page 89
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast