Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Cattani Amadori

Deceased

Priest of Modigliana

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1856BornMaradi, Italy
5 Oct 187923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Modigliana, Italy
14 Feb 192467.8AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
16 Dec 193579.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 193579.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
11 Apr 194386.9DiedPriest of Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Cattani Amadori:
Federico Cardinal Cattani Amadori (born , died ) Priest of Modigliana

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a cardinal for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015