Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aliprando Catani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Camaldolesi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1915Born
12 Sep 193217.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Aug 193823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
196347.9AppointedPrior General of Order of Saint Benedict
196953.9ResignedPrior General of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Jun 200590.4DiedPrior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Aliprando Catani:
Father Aliprando Catani O.S.B. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

  • a priest for 66.8 years

Source(s):
  • bd/prof/op: CB, 29 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015