Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Catalini

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1642Born
1 Apr 168643.6AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
1 May 170360.6DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Catalini
Bishop Giuseppe Catalini (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanzaro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast