Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Catalani

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1653BornCorato
29 Feb 167622.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 170652.9AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
Oct 1709³56.5DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Catalani:
Bishop Domenico Catalani (born , died Oct 1709) Bishop of Termoli

  • a priest for 33.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015