Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Castillo Vintimilla

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1692³Born
22 Jul 173846.4AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
31 Jul 174755.4AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
15 Nov 174957.7DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Castillo Vintimilla
Bishop Francisco Castillo Vintimilla (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrussels, Belgium

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 57, Number 254
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115, and Page 225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018