Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1633SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
19 Dec 1633ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
27 Oct 1634DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Castro:
Bishop Miguel de Castro (died ) Bishop of Viseu

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013