Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Castro, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1547BornToledo, Spain
7 Jan 160861.0AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
Jun 1609³62.4ResignedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
1 Aug 161164.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Castro:
Archbishop Juan Castro O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santafé en Nueva Granada

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,378
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 124, Number 795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 187
  • ~c2: CB, 17 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014