Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Castilla

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1460Born
23 Jun 149434.4AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
14 Feb 149838.1AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Oct 151050.8DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Castilla
Bishop Juan de Castilla (born 1460, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalencia, Diocese of Palencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98, and Page 227
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1494, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast