Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano de Castillo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1658BornTermini
Sep 1674³16.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
8 Jan 169132.5AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
21 Jan 169132.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
22 Mar 169435.7DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano de Castillo:
Bishop Gaetano de Castillo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a bishop for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015