Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de Casso, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 May 1561ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Jun 1603AppointedBishop of León, Spain
13 May 1607DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Casso
Bishop Andrés de Casso O.P. (died ) Bishop of León

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 118, Number 751
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,603, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast