Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Álvaro Pires de Castro e Noronha

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1669BornLisboa
6 Apr 169828.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Apr 169828.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 171141.7AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
29 Mar 173767.8DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Álvaro Pires de Castro e Noronha:
Bishop Álvaro Pires de Castro e Noronha (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

  • a priest for 38.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 321
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015