Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Castromediano

Deceased

Bishop of Lecce, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511²Born
26 Feb 153524.1AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
17 Jan 155241.0DiedBishop of Lecce, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Castromediano
Bishop Giovanni Battista Castromediano (born 1511, died ) Bishop of Lecce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce, Diocese of Lecce

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 4*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224
  • bp/bd: CB, 6 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast