Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Castro Lemos

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1545AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
5 Jun 1555AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
1 Aug 1561DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Castro Lemos:
Bishop Pedro Castro Lemos (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 57, Number 316
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 174, and Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Nov 2013