Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Casini

Deceased

Administrator of Grosseto

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateEventTitle
1406¹AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
2 Nov 1407Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
1408²AppointedBishop of Siena, Italy
24 May 1426AppointedAdministrator of Siena, Italy
24 May 1426Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 1426AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
12 Sep 1427AppointedAdministrator of Grosseto, Italy
4 Feb 1439DiedAdministrator of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Casini:
Cardinal Antonio Casini (died ) Administrator of Grosseto

  • a bishop for 31.3 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013