Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Casini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1648BornArezzo, Italy
166213.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 May 171263.5Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jul 171263.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
14 Feb 171970.3DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Casini:
Cardinal Francesco Maria Casini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

  • a cardinal for 6.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013