Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Casarino, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1593AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
15 Aug 1593Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
1 Mar 1600DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Casarino
Bishop Angelo Casarino O.P. (died ) Bishop of Caorle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopSan Niccol˛, Church, Treviso, Diocese of Treviso

  • a bishop for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 133
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1593, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018