Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jaime Cardinal de Casanova

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1435¹BornJátiva, Spain
31 May 150368.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 150368.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
4 Jun 150469.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jaime de Casanova:
Jaime Cardinal de Casanova (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

  • a cardinal for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 31 May 1503
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 247, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015