Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Carrara

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1716Born
14 Feb 178568.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 178568.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
11 Apr 179174.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
26 Mar 179376.3DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Francesco Carrara
Francesco Cardinal Carrara (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBergamo, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast