Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baglione Carradoli

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹Born
16 Nov 162648.8AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
5 Jun 162850.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
3 May 162951.3DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baglione Carradoli:
Bishop Baglione Carradoli (died ) Bishop of Marsi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232, and Page 365
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015