Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Caro

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹BornBisinianen
24 Sep 162223.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 166667.0AppointedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy
Sep 167172.7DiedBishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Caro:
Bishop Giuseppe Caro Bishop of Ruvo (Ruo)(di Puglia)

  • a priest for 48.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013