Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus von Carlowitz

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502Born
15 Jan 155048.0SelectedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
14 Jul 155048.5ConfirmedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
27 Apr 155553.3DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus von Carlowitz
Bishop Nikolaus von Carlowitz (born 1502, died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaschendorf

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018