Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Cardona

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1529AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
4 Feb 1530Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
23 Jan 1531AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
13 Nov 1532DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Cardona:
Archbishop Luis Cardona (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308, and Page 129
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 42, Number 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015