Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Karith

Deceased

Bishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1448¹Born
4 Jul 149850.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
11 Nov 149850.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
1499²51.0SucceededBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
26 Nov 152173.9DiedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Karith (VIAF: 81556350)
Bishop Martin Karith (born 1448, died ) Bishop of Kammin (Camin)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 116
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,436
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,498, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast