Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Cardona, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Superior of Lunda, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1876Born
15 Sep 189822.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
28 Oct 190327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
4 May 192650.0AppointedSuperior of Lunda, Angola
194063.6ResignedSuperior of Lunda, Angola

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Cardona
Father Giovanni Cardona C.S.Sp. (born ) Superior of Lunda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCovilha, Portugal

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018