Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paulo Cardinal de Carvalho de Mendoça

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (news of his death arrived after the announcement)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702Born
18 Dec 176967.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Jan 177068.0Died
29 Jan 177068.0Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication

MicroData Summary for Paulo de Carvalho de Mendoça
Paulo Cardinal de Carvalho de Mendoça (born 1702, died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisbon, Portugal

  • a cardinal for .0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1769

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018