Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Carl Laurenz Cardona

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1711BornBautzen
173523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
27 Jan 177260.5AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
25 Aug 177362.0DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Carl Laurenz Cardona:
Priest Carl Laurenz Cardona (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

  • a priest for 38.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013