Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Caracciolo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1425¹Born
25 Oct 147550.8AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
8 Mar 148459.1AppointedBishop of Lecce, Italy
18 Jul 148560.5AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
149570.0DiedBishop of Aquino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto Caracciolo (VIAF: 61554682)
Bishop Roberto Caracciolo O.F.M. (born 1425, died 1495) Bishop of Aquino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLecce, Diocese of Lecce

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 92, and Page 177
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 45*
  • bp: CB, 6 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast