Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista de Capua

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Carrhae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1687Born
23 Dec 171326.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 172941.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Capua
Bishop Giovanni Battista de Capua (born ) Titular Bishop of Carrhae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapua, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 144
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018