Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Caprara

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626BornBologna, Italy
17 May 170680.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170680.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
9 Jun 171185.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Caprara:
Alessandro Cardinal Caprara (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

  • a cardinal for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015