Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Capano, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1659BornNapoli
21 Jun 170040.6AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
24 Jun 170040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
14 Jan 172060.2DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Capano:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Capano C.R. (died ) Bishop of Bitonto

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 121
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013