Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marceliano Eduardo Canyes Santacana, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Leticia

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1913BornVilafranca del Penedès, Spain
21 Dec 193522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Jan 195238.8AppointedPrefect of Leticia, Colombia
4 Mar 198976.0ResignedPrefect of Leticia, Colombia
10 May 198976.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Leticia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Marceliano Eduardo Canyes Santacana:
Father Marceliano Eduardo Canyes Santacana O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Leticia

  • a priest for 53.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015