Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Anselm of Canterbury, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1033Born
106027.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Mar 109360.1AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
4 Dec 109360.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
21 Apr 110976.3DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for St. Anselm of Canterbury
Archbishop St. Anselm of Canterbury O.S.B. (born 1033, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAosta

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 7
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018