Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Cano de Haro, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1564BornEcija
8 Aug 163369.4AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
21 May 163470.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
163974.8DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Cano de Haro:
Bishop Domingo Cano de Haro O.P. (born ) Bishop of Cádiz

  • a bishop for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,408
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013