Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Cano Sandoval

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
14 Jul 168252.5SelectedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
7 Dec 168252.9ConfirmedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
8 Aug 168353.6InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
21 Feb 169565.1DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Cano Sandoval
Bishop Juan Cano Sandoval (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast