Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Saverio Cardinal Canale (Canali)

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1695Born
26 Sep 176671.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176671.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
20 Mar 177378.0DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary for Saverio Canale (Canali)
Saverio Cardinal Canale (Canali) (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerni, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018