Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alejandro Cañál, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1852Born
1869¹16.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Jun 187523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
28 Oct 189846.7DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Nov 189846.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China
23 Nov 189846.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Cañál
Father Alejandro Cañál O.P. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Félix de Valdesoto, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain

  • a priest for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 125
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017