Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francisco Xavier Caminero y Muñoz

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1830Born
1858¹27.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 188554.3AppointedBishop of León, Spain
13 Apr 188554.3DiedBishop-Elect of León, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier Caminero y Muñoz (VIAF: 305310011)
Father Francisco Xavier Caminero y Muñoz (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervatos de la Cueza

  • a priest for 27.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 336
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017