Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Camuzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1568AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
9 Jan 1569Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
8 May 1602DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Camuzzi:
Bishop Eugenio Camuzzi (died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 117
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 14, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013