Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Campanelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1739BornMantelica, Italy
30 Mar 178949.9Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 178950.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
29 Nov 179051.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
26 Sep 179152.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
18 Feb 179555.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Filippo Campanelli:
Cardinal Filippo Campanelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

  • a cardinal for 5.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013