Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomaso Campeggi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1483¹Born
1 Jun 152037.4AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
27 Dec 152643.9Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
17 Apr 155976.2ResignedBishop of Feltre, Italy
21 Jan 156481.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomaso Campeggi (VIAF: 243932657)
Bishop Tomaso Campeggi (born 1483, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Feltre

  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016