Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ubaldino Cambi Bonamici

Deceased

Archbishop of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1391AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
8 Mar 1393AppointedArchbishop of Torres, Italy
4 Apr 1397AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
1400¹DiedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ubaldino Cambi Bonamici
Archbishop Ubaldino Cambi Bonamici (died 1400) Archbishop of Oristano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 504, and Page 102
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast