Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Leopoldo Cardinal Calcagnini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1679Born
9 Sep 174364.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174364.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
27 Aug 174667.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

MicroData Summary for Carlo Leopoldo Calcagnini (VIAF: 66850255)
Carlo Leopoldo Cardinal Calcagnini (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018