Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Marino Carafa di Belvedere

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1764Born
23 Feb 180137.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 180137.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
24 Aug 180743.5ResignedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
5 Apr 183066.1Died

MicroData Summary for Marino Carafa di Belvedere (VIAF: 89742731)
(Layman) Marino Carafa di Belvedere (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.5 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Mar 2017