Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Caccia-Piatti (Cacciapiatti)

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1751BornNovara, Italy
8 Mar 181665.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181665.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
15 Sep 183382.5DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Caccia-Piatti (Cacciapiatti):
Cardinal Giovanni Caccia-Piatti (Cacciapiatti) (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 17.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013