Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Butler, S.J. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Limerick, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1727Born
7 Sep 174518.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
16 Jun 175325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Apr 177850.6AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
11 Jan 177951.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Limerick, Ireland
20 Jun 178658.8DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Limerick, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for John Butler
Father John Butler S.J. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Limerick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCahir, Co. Tipperary
Ordained PriestLiège

  • a priest for 33.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 262
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 42
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast