Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simone Cardinal Buonacorsi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1708Born
18 Jul 176354.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Aug 176354.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
17 Dec 176355.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 177667.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

MicroData Summary for Simone Buonacorsi
Simone Cardinal Buonacorsi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata, Italy

  • a priest for 12.3 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Jul 1763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018