Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William D. Buckley, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Superior General of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1907Born
16 Aug 192619.1ProfessedMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
196153.5AppointedSuperior General of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
27 Jun 197062.9DiedSuperior General of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales

MicroData Summary for William D. Buckley
Father William D. Buckley O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Superior General of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast