Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Brunetti

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹Born
17 Dec 167226.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
23 Dec 167327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Oct 169347.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Oct 169347.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
28 Mar 170357.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Brunetti
Bishop Johann Brunetti (born 1646, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMassa di Carrara

  • a priest for 29.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,693, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast