Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Brullaughan (Ó Brolcháin)

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1695¹Born
21 Apr 174954.3SelectedBishop of Derry, Ireland
7 May 174954.3ConfirmedBishop of Derry, Ireland
10 Jun 175055.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Brullaughan (Ó Brolcháin)
Father John Brullaughan (Ó Brolcháin) (born 1695) Former Bishop-Elect of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallymenagh

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 194
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast